Morgan, Lenna Mary (CPSO#: 59502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
218-2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 944-9924
Fax: (519) 944-7282
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lenna Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Morgan ( CPSO# 59502 )

Business Address:
218 - 2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 944-9924

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LENNA MARY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1991