Morgan, Matthew William (CPSO#: 63865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 427
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4680
Fax: (416) 586-8350
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN, Toronto General Hospital
Thrombosis Treatment Program
Unit 7N Room 739
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-3423
Fax: (416) 340-5682
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M W Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Morgan ( CPSO# 63865 )

Business Address:
UHN, Toronto General Hospital
Thrombosis Treatment Program
Unit 7N Room 739
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3423

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 427
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW WILLIAM MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1992