Morgan, Nancy Angel Elise Marie (CPSO#: 79275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: SanCartier, Nancy Angel Elise Marie (used until: 29 Mar 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 522-9017
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Aug 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Nancy  Angel  Elise  Marie Morgan may practise medicine independently as a
            hospitalist, only.