Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Morgan, Roger Edward (CPSO#: 16085)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 25 May 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1957
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 25 May 1994

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 May 1993
Summary:

 In February 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Morgan guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Morgan's licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 09 May 1994
Hearing Date(s): 09 Jul 1992