Morgan, Scott Carlyle (CPSO#: 79666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70206
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott C. Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morgan ( CPSO# 79666 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Box 903
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 06 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT CARLYLE MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 06 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009