Morgenthau, David Richard (CPSO#: 32166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: (416) 256-9115
Fax: (416) 256-9400
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Multiple Sclerosis Clinic
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416 864 5377
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Morgenthau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morgenthau ( CPSO# 32166 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 256-9115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD MORGENTHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGENTHAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1981