Mori, Michael Kiyoshi (CPSO#: 75122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 First Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 2C7
Phone: (519) 943-0712
Fax: (519) 943-0284
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Mori Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mori ( CPSO# 75122 )

Business Address:
24 First Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 2C7
Phone Number: (519) 943-0712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KIYOSHI MORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002