Mori Torres, Elisea Mercedes (CPSO#: 54473)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2006 to 08 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2006