Moriarity, Tracey Ann Therese (CPSO#: 59408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Family Medical Group
Suite 201
133 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V3
Phone: (905) 628-6355
Fax: (905) 628-0664
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vadera And Moriarity Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vadera ( CPSO# 60854 )
Dr. T. Moriarity ( CPSO# 59408 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Dundas Family Medical Group
Suite 201
133 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V3
Phone Number: (905) 628-6355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACEY ANN THERESE MORIARITY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIARITY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1989