Moriarty, Brian Gerard (CPSO#: 62163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bon Secours Hospital
Kerry Clinic
Strand Street
Tralee County Kerry xxxx
Phone: 066 7129755

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. BRIAN GERARD MORIARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIARTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992