Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Morin, Francois (CPSO#: 57875)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 30 Nov 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Nov 1988