Morin, Heather Ann (CPSO#: 86971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces
Health Services Centre
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 945-1505
Fax: (613) 945-1509
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANN MORIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2009 to 07 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010