Morin, Jason Matthew (CPSO#: 71493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health Services
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone: (905) 356-2236
Fax: (905) 356-2568
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Matthew Morin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morin ( CPSO# 71493 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health Services
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone Number: (905) 356-2236

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON MATTHEW MORIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1999