Morin, Joseph Norbert Jean Francois (CPSO#: 54757)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1989