Morin, Marie-Philippe (CPSO#: 109920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Weight management clinic
Ottawa hospital, civic campus
Maurice Grimes Lodge 3th floor
1053 carling avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5101
Fax: (613) 761-5343
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-PHILIPPE MORIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2016