Morison, Michael Arthur (CPSO#: 22061)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Morison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014