Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Morissette, Louis Gabriel (CPSO#: 24273)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Dec 1992
Summary:

In a decision which was released in December 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. 
Morissette guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 
448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine 
that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.   Consequently, the Committee imposed the 
following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Morissette was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
      the Register. 
 
   2. Dr. Morissette s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of 36 months.  This 
      suspension was itself to be suspended on the following terms and conditions: 
 
      (a) Dr. Morissette was to continue in therapy with his present psychiatrist or an 
          alternative therapist suggested by him and approved by the Registrar. 
 
      (b) Dr. Morissette was to continue regularly to participate in the programs directed by 
          Alcoholics Anonymous and his community s Professional Support Group. 
 
      (c) Dr. Morissette was to continue to participate in a program of psychotherapeutic 
          training under his present Director or an alternate suggested by him and approved 
          by the Registrar. 
 
      (d) The suspension of Dr. Morissette s suspension was to be dependent upon reports 
          being submitted every six months to the Registrar which, in his sole judgment, were 
          deemed to be satisfactory. 
 
      (e) Dr. Morissette was not to enter into psychotherapeutic treatment with a female 
          patient for a period of one year; thereafter, he was to be permitted to commence 
          such therapy upon the approval of his psychiatrist and Director, or their alternates. 
 
   3. In the event that, in the judgment of the Registrar, Dr. Morissette failed to comply with 
      any of these terms and conditions, the full suspension was to commence on a date to be 
      fixed by the Registrar, not to exceed sixty days from the date on which the default, in the 
      opinion of the Registrar, had occurred. 
 
   4. If Dr. Morissette s actions were the subject of a subsequent Hearing before the Discipline 
      Committee of the College, the record of this Hearing was to form part of that procedure. 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 22 Jan 1992

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 11, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Morissette has been the subject of College investigations into allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct, including by breaching his undertaking to the College and practicing medicine while incapacitated, including prescribing medications, providing medical opinions and/or assessments, and seeing patients. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Morissette resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.