Morley, Gregory John Eggleton (CPSO#: 56633)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989