Morley-Forster, Patricia Kathleen (CPSO#: 33388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morley-Forster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Morley-Forster ( CPSO# 33388 )

Business Address:
38 Penrith Court
London ON  N6G 4M7
Phone Number: (519) 858-0821

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA KATHLEEN MORLEY-FORSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORLEY-FORSTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1977 to 15 Jun 1978
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Mar 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1982