Morlock, John Scott (CPSO#: 52573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B106
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone: (519) 748-8510
Fax: 888-706-0513
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. S. Morlock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morlock ( CPSO# 52573 )

Business Address:
Suite B106
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 748-8510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN SCOTT MORLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORLOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1985