Moro, Jaydeep Krishnakant (CPSO#: 66496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Young Street
Suite 505
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 540-8448
Fax: (905) 540-8414
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaydeep Moro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moro ( CPSO# 66496 )

Business Address:
Suite 505
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 540-8448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAYDEEP KRISHNAKANT MORO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998