Moroz, Paul John (CPSO#: 61293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shriners Hospitals for Children
Honolulu
1310 Punahou Street
Honolulu HI  96826
United States
Phone: 808-951-3640
Fax: 808-951-3718
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moroz-Schnurr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut
USA - Hawaii

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JOHN MOROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOROZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990