Morra, Pasqualino (CPSO#: 59597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1400 Ritson Road North
Suite 4
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: (905) 404-2900
Fax: (905) 404-0992
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

247 Simcoe St N
Suite 301
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Canada
Phone: (905) 438-0555
Fax: (905) 434-7963
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1615 Dundas ST E
Suite 20
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Canada
Phone: 905-436-2273
Fax: 905-436-2263
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PASQUALINO MORRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1989