Morrin, Sharon Mary Landry (CPSO#: 70388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: Landry, Sharon Mary (used until: 21 Apr 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M.L. Morrin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morrin ( CPSO# 70388 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON MARY LANDRY MORRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2002