Morris, Andrew Mark (CPSO#: 68133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 415
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8102
Fax: (416) 586-8864
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Morris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morris ( CPSO# 68133 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 602-5281

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 602-5281

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 602-5281

Business Address:
Suite 415
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW MARK MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998