Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Morris, Barbara Diane (CPSO#: 61064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: 613-728-7700
Fax: 613-728-5848
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Morris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Morris ( CPSO# 61064 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 728-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA DIANE MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1990