Morris, Chester Norman (CPSO#: 62693)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999