Morris, Graham (CPSO#: 25357)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Nepali

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000