Morris, Neil (CPSO#: 21322)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 1996