Morris, Patricia Ellen (CPSO#: 30647)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.E. Morris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Telephone: 416-398-0638 Fax: 416-398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 30 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015