Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Morris, Randi Ellen (CPSO#: 68247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jewish General Hospital
Herzl Clinic
3755 Cote St Catharine Road
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8278
Fax: (514) 340-8298

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDI ELLEN MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996