Morris, Warren P (CPSO#: 57053)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006