Morrison, Andree Yvette (CPSO#: 66729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Andree Morrison Medical
Professional Corporation
172 Ethel Street, P.O. Box F1
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone: (705) 753-5205
Fax: (705) 753-5236
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andree Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2008


Corporation Name: Andree Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morrison ( CPSO# 66729 )

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
Suite 5
172 Ethel Street
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone Number: (705) 753-5205

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREE YVETTE MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1995