Morrison, Belinda Frederica (CPSO#: 83948)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2006 to 16 Jan 2006
PEAP - Resident - Urology

University of Toronto, 17 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2006