Morrison, Catherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 61060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Diagnostic Imaging
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43466
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Radiology Consultants
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-4531
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Radiology
1 St. Andrews Drive
Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. E. Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morrison ( CPSO# 61060 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
LL01
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 722-8036

Business Address:
Barrie Medical Arts
Suite 114-115
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 726-4531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990