Morrison, Cynthia Mary (CPSO#: 52753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 21
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-0311
Fax: (613) 623-4095
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boersma Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morrison ( CPSO# 52753 )
Dr. J. Boersma ( CPSO# 52780 )

Business Address:
Suite 21
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-0311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA MARY MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985