Morrison, Gavin Comgall (CPSO#: 69513)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: IWK Health Centre Department of Paediatric Critical Care 5850/5980 University Avenue Halifax, Nova Scotia B3K 6R8
Date Received: 05 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2013