Morrison, Katalin Maria (CPSO#: 42309)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: kati@rogers.com
Instructions: Medical records have been kept for 10 years and will be shredded at the end of this year. Please contact Dr. Morrison by email if you need your medical records.
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014