Morrison, Laurie Jean (CPSO#: 33450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rescu, Li Ka Shing Knowledge Inst
St Michael's Hospital
5th Floor
193 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1M8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 7849
Fax: (416) 864-5934
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laurie J. Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Morrison ( CPSO# 33450 )

Business Address:
Rescu, Li Ka Shing Knowledge Institute
St Michael's Hospital
193 Yonge Street
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE JEAN MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1987