Morrison, Scott Patrick (CPSO#: 66497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morrison ( CPSO# 66497 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospitals
Sault Ste Marie General Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT PATRICK MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998