Morrison, Tara (CPSO#: 76680)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014