Morrissey, Jean-Pierre Patrick (CPSO#: 64839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
292 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 6B7
Phone: (613) 745-5651
Fax: (613) 745-7947
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Pierre Morrissey Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morrissey ( CPSO# 64839 )

Business Address:
200 - 292 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 6B7
Phone Number: (613) 745-5651

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-PIERRE PATRICK MORRISSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISSEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Mar 1992 to 30 Apr 1992
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1992