Morrow, Gary Lawrence (CPSO#: 61045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Eye Centre
Suite 204
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 461-0123
Fax: (416) 462-2857
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Morrow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Morrow ( CPSO# 61045 )

Business Address:
East Toronto Eye Centre
204 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 461-0123

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 27 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY LAWRENCE MORROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORROW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990