Morrow, Nathan Jerome (CPSO#: 17880)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 26 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 2015