Morrow, Sarah Anne (CPSO#: 77686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital LHSC
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2993
Fax: (519) 663-3116
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah A. Morrow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morrow ( CPSO# 77686 )

Business Address:
University Hospital LHSC
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2993

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE MORROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORROW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2009