Morse, Janet Louise (CPSO#: 63692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone: (905) 889-3634
Fax: (905) 889-3986
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larsen Morse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2012

Dr. J. Morse ( CPSO# 63692 )
Dr. D. Larsen ( CPSO# 61037 )

Business Address:
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone Number: (905) 889-3634

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre 3rd Floor
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JANET LOUISE MORSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992