Morse, John Lyman Chown (CPSO#: 21504)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henry Willa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 May 2002