Morson, Natalie Catherine (CPSO#: 84301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Murray St.
4th Floor
Box 25
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5157
Fax: (416) 586-3175
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE CATHERINE MORSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008