Morton, Alexander Ross (CPSO#: 60378)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Manchester, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017