Morton, Gerard Christopher (CPSO#: 66201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6165
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerard C. Morton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Morton ( CPSO# 66201 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sunnybrook Regional
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6165

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 May 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD CHRISTOPHER MORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1996